skip to content

Le Gal, Gregoire

CPSO#: 87848

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Apr 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 10 Jul 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:UNIVERSITE DE BREST, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Division of Hematology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8060
Fax: (613) 737-8093 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Gregoire Le Gal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Le Gal ( CPSO# 87848 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Division of Hematology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8060


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



France

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Nov 2007 to 30 Nov 2007
PEAP - CF - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Dec 2007 to 31 Oct 2008
CF - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 13 Apr 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Apr 2016 Active
 1.    Dr. Gregoire Le Gal may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division  of  Hematology, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. Le Gal
                        holds an academic appointment at the rank of Full Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically expires when Dr. Le Gal no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.