THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 20:11:22 PM
Le Gal, Gregoire
CPSO#:
87848
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Apr 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
10 Jul 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Spanish
Education: UNIVERSITE DE BREST, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Division of Hematology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8060
Fax: (613) 737-8093
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
France
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cornwall Community Hospital |
Cornwall |
Hopital Montfort |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Nov 2007 to 30 Nov 2007
PEAP - CF - Hematology
University of Ottawa, 01 Dec 2007 to 31 Oct 2008
CF - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Nov 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Dec 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Oct 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 2012 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 13 Apr 2016 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Apr 2016 |
|
Active |