skip to content

Lane, Alan Thomas

CPSO#: 85151

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Aug 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Department of Anaesthesia
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8187 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: A.T. Lane Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 23 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lane ( CPSO# 85151 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Anaesthesia
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Moosonee Site Moosonee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 07 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALAN THOMAS LANE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jul 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 31 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2012