THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 6:28:02 AM
Lane, Alan Thomas
CPSO#:
85151
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Aug 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Aug 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Dublin, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Department of Anaesthesia
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8187
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Moosonee Site |
Moosonee |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:07 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALAN THOMAS LANE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jul 2006
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 31 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Aug 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Aug 2012 |