skip to content

Lamschtein, Claudia

CPSO#: 90054

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Jun 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: French, Hebrew, Spanish

Education: University of the Republic, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1145 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone: 613 7226521 Ext. 6702 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

199 Richmond St W
Toronto ON  M5V 0H4
Canada
Phone: 1 416 671 5476
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

103-778 Sheppard Ave W
Toronto ON  M3H 6B7
Canada
Phone: 6473475000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Manitoba
New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:26 Aug 2020 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CLAUDIA LAMSCHTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAMSCHTEIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 15 Dec 2008 to 05 Mar 2009
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 06 Mar 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
CF - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
CF - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2021