THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 7:13:48 AM
Lamschtein, Claudia
CPSO#:
90054
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Jun 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jun 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Hebrew, Spanish
Education: University of the Republic, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 9600 Stn Main
825 Manitoba Ave, Selkirk , MB
Forensic Psychiatry
Barnett Building
Selkirk ON R1A 2B5
Phone: 204 482 3810 Ext. 655
Fax: 204 785 8936
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Manitoba
New Brunswick
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:26 Aug 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CLAUDIA LAMSCHTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAMSCHTEIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 15 Dec 2008 to 05 Mar 2009
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 06 Mar 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
CF - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 15 Dec 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Mar 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 2021 |