skip to content

Lambert, Colin Douglas

CPSO#: 29954

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 14 Jun 1978

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Oxford University, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Attn: Dr. Colin Douglas Lambert St. Michael’s Hospital 30 Bond Street Toronto, Ontario M5B 1W8
Date Received: 15 Dec 2009

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:29 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2006