THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 18:38:32 PM
Lambert, Colin Douglas
CPSO#:
29954
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
14 Jun 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Oxford Medical Sciences Di, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
Attn: Dr. Colin Douglas Lambert
St. Michael’s Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto, Ontario
M5B 1W8
Date Received: 15 Dec 2009
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:29 Nov 1977 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1976 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1978 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2006 |