skip to content

Lam, Wai Fan Fanny

CPSO#: 85989

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 11 May 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Chinese University of Hong Kong, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Mar 2007 to 10 May 2007
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Neurology

University Of Toronto, 11 May 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 May 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007