THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 7:54:28 AM
Lam, Wai Fan Fanny
CPSO#:
85989
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
11 May 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Chinese University of Hong Kong, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2007 to 10 May 2007
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 11 May 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Paediatric Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 02 Mar 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 May 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |