skip to content

McAuley, Leanne Michelle

CPSO#: 95106

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1151 Richmond Street
UCC - Room 11, Western University
London ON  N6A 3K7
Phone: (519) 661-3030
Fax: (519) 661-3380 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S Petis L McAuley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Petis ( CPSO# 95410 )
Dr. L. McAuley ( CPSO# 95106 )

Business Address:
Western University
UCC - Room 11
1151 Richmond Street
London ON  N6A 3K7
Phone Number: (519) 661-3030

Business Address:
Suite 104
333 Athlone Avenue
Woodstock ON  N4V 0B8
Phone Number: (519) 533-6970

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LEANNE MICHELLE MCAULEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCAULEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2013