skip to content

Makerewich, Leonard Alexander

CPSO#: 29772

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Feb 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Apr 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Optimist Square
4725 Dorchester Road
Unit B15
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 0A8
Phone: (905) 374-2451
Fax: (905) 374-9267 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Niagara Snoring and Sleep Centre
6453 Morrision Street
Suite 204
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 7H1
Canada
Phone: 905-374-6453
Fax: 888-905-6992
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Makerewich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Makerewich ( CPSO# 29772 )

Business Address:
Unit B15
Optimist Square
4725 Dorchester Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 0A8
Phone Number: (905) 374-2451

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 29 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LEONARD ALEXANDER MAKEREWICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAKEREWICH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2012
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 12 Dec 2012
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 12 Feb 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2013