skip to content

Lee, Linda Li-Wen

CPSO#: 57134

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Oct 1987

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Chen, Linda Li-Wen (used until: 18 Feb 1987 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Centre for Family Medicine
10B Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON  N2G 1C5
Phone: (519) 783-0023
Fax: (519) 783-0033 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Linda L. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Lee ( CPSO# 57134 )

Business Address:
25 Joseph Street
Kitchener ON  N2B 4X6
Phone Number: (519) 578-2022

Business Address:
The Centre for Family Medicine
10B Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON  N2G 1C5
Phone Number: (519) 783-0023

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LINDA LI-WEN LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 1987