skip to content

Erdman, Laura Kelly

CPSO#: 103637

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Oct 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Oct 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Infectious Disease
Department of Pediatrics
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON  N6A 5W9
Canada
Phone: 4163715082
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jeremy Adams Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 14 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Adams ( CPSO# 88766 )
Dr. L. Erdman ( CPSO# 103637)

Business Address:
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-1500

Business Address:
St. Josepsh's Healthcare Hamilton
50 Charlton St.
Fontbonne Building
5th Floor Room F543
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: 905-522-1155

Business Address:
Suite 205
589 Lake Street
St Catharines ON  L2N 7L6
Phone Number: (905) 935-4763

Business Address:
Niagara Health System
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 978-4647

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:13 Jun 2019 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective:23 Sep 2020 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LAURA KELLY ERDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ERDMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 05 Mar 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 06 Mar 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 12 Mar 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 13 Mar 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 12 Mar 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 13 Mar 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 12 Mar 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 13 Mar 2020 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 09 Sep 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 19 Oct 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
CF - Pediatric Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Sep 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2020