skip to content

Daly, Lanval Joseph

CPSO#: 27674

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 08 Aug 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Queen's University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Lanval J. Daly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 31 2022
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

The Clinic At Beverly Hills
33 Beverly Hills Drive , Toronto, ON
M3L 1A2
Date Received: 31 May 2022


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Montserrat

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.


Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  December 15, 2017
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On December 15, 2017, St. Joseph’s Health Centre notified the College that Dr. Lanval Joseph Daly’s elective surgical privileges at St. Joseph’s Health Centre have been suspended, effective December 15, 2017.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:14 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1975
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 08 Aug 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Apr 2021
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2022

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: April 27, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Lanval Joseph Daly to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 27, 2021:

Dr. Daly’s practice is restricted to the following office-based gynecological procedures:

Pap smears
Insertion and removal of intrauterine devices (IUDs)
Diaphragm fitting and removal
Initial investigation of abnormal cytology of vulva and/or vagina or cervix under colposcopic technique with or without biopsy(ies) or endocervical curetting
Follow up colposcopy with or without biopsy(ies) and/or endocervical curetting
Excision of cervical and vaginal polyps
Biopsy of vulva with or without fulguration
Endometrial biopsies

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence

On March 15, 2012, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Toronto, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. Daly.