THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 22:23:03 PM
Daly, Lanval Joseph
CPSO#:
27674
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
08 Aug 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Lanval J. Daly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 31 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:The Clinic At Beverly Hills
33 Beverly Hills Drive , Toronto, ON
M3L 1A2
Date Received: 31 May 2022
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Montserrat
Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: December 15, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On December 15, 2017, St. Joseph’s Health Centre notified the College that Dr. Lanval Joseph Daly’s elective surgical privileges at St. Joseph’s Health Centre have been suspended, effective December 15, 2017.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:14 Nov 1977 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1971 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1973 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Aug 1974 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Aug 1975 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member |
Effective: 08 Aug 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Apr 2021 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2022 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: April 27, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Lanval Joseph Daly to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 27, 2021:
Dr. Daly’s practice is restricted to the following office-based gynecological procedures:
Pap smears
Insertion and removal of intrauterine devices (IUDs)
Diaphragm fitting and removal
Initial investigation of abnormal cytology of vulva and/or vagina or cervix under colposcopic technique with or without biopsy(ies) or endocervical curetting
Follow up colposcopy with or without biopsy(ies) and/or endocervical curetting
Excision of cervical and vaginal polyps
Biopsy of vulva with or without fulguration
Endometrial biopsies
Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On March 15, 2012, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Toronto, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. Daly.