skip to content

Kyrillos, Edmond

CPSO#: 87190

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Jul 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 25 Aug 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French, Spanish

Education:Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Méde, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Edmond Kyrillos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 18 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Docudavit Solutions Tel: 1 888 781 9083 Fax: 1 866 297 9338 email: [email protected]
Instructions: For further information, you may contact Caremedics Elmvale. Unit 18 1910 St Laurent Boulevard Ottawa, ON K1G 1A4 Tel: 613 523 5550 Fax: 613 523 5580
Date Received: 16 Sep 2015


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 14 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2009
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jul 2016