THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 5:38:43 AM
Kyrillos, Edmond
CPSO#:
87190
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
26 Jul 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
25 Aug 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, French, Spanish
Education: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Méde, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Edmond Kyrillos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 18 2016
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:For further information, you may contact Caremedics Elmvale.
Unit 18
1910 St Laurent Boulevard
Ottawa, ON K1G 1A4
Tel: 613 523 5550
Fax: 613 523 5580
Docudavit Solutions
Tel: 1 888 781 9083
Fax: 1 866 297 9338
email: [email protected]
Date Received: 16 Sep 2015
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Dec 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 14 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Dec 2009 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 2015 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 2015 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 26 Jul 2016 |