skip to content

Kuraishi, Aqdas Sarfaraz

CPSO#: 28073

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 04 Aug 2004
EXPIRY DATE
04 Aug 2004
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 04 Feb 2003

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish, Urdu

Education:University Of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 1974 to 30 Jun 1975
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1975 to 30 Jun 1976
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Nov 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jul 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2003
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Aug 2004