THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 9:07:34 AM
Kuraishi, Aqdas Sarfaraz
CPSO#:
28073
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
04 Aug 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
04 Feb 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish, Urdu
Education: University of Toronto, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1976 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1974 to 30 Jun 1975
Resident 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1975 to 30 Jun 1976
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1974 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Mar 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 28 Nov 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Aug 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 10 Jul 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Feb 2003 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 04 Aug 2004 |