skip to content

Kritzinger, Fiona Elize

CPSO#: 89438

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2009
EXPIRY DATE
31 Dec 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 26 Aug 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Stellenbosch, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
25 D.F. Malan Street
Cape Town
Cape Town 8001
South Africa
Phone: +2772574963

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Aug 2008
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
CF - Paediatric Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2009