THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 1:08:58 AM
Kritzinger, Fiona Elize
CPSO#:
89438
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Mar 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
23 Mar 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of Stellenbosch, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:23 Mar 2022 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Pediatric Respirology |
Effective:23 Mar 2022 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Aug 2008
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 23 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
CF - Pediatric Respirology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Mar 2022 |
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Expiry Date: 22 Mar 2029 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Mar 2022 |
|
Active |