skip to content

Krieger, Howard Marvin

CPSO#: 25085

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Aug 1972
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Apr 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
200 - 11 Ferris Lane
Barrie ON  L4M 5N6
Phone: (705) 739-8667
Fax: (705) 739-9341 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

C M H A
90 Mulcaster St.
Barrie ON  L4M 3M5
Canada
Phone: (705) 726-5033 Ext. x833
Fax: (705) 725-0646
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

110 Lillian Cres
Woods Park Care Centre
Barrie ON  L4N 5H7
Canada
Phone: (705) 719-3697
Fax: (249) 888-1004
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HOWARD MARVIN KRIEGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRIEGER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1972
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 11 Sep 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 12 Sep 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2019