THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 17:05:05 PM
Krieger, Howard Marvin
CPSO#:
25085
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
16 Aug 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Apr 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
16-Aug-2022
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Aug 1972 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Aug 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 09 Aug 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 11 Sep 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 12 Sep 2017 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Apr 2019 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 16 Aug 2022 |