skip to content

Krasnik, Catherine Eva

CPSO#: 85546

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Oct 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Oct 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: 905-378-4647 Ext. 49463 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. C. Krasnik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Krasnik ( CPSO# 85546 )

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



New Zealand

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:31 Aug 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CATHERINE EVA KRASNIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRASNIK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Sep 2006 to 31 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2009 to 31 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2011 to 30 Sep 2012
CF - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2011