THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 1:16:55 AM
Krasnik, Catherine Eva
CPSO#:
85546
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Oct 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Oct 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Croatian, English, French
Education: McMaster University, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON L2S 0A9
Phone: 905-378-4647 Ext. 49463
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Zealand
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:31 Aug 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CATHERINE EVA KRASNIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRASNIK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2006 to 31 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2009 to 31 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Oct 2011 to 30 Sep 2012
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Oct 2011 |