skip to content

Kopac, Daniel Slawomir

CPSO#: 92549

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 11 Aug 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 311-6051 Gilbert Road Richmond BC V7C 3V3
Date Received: 21 Jun 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective:11 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 08 Mar 2010 to 04 Apr 2010
EL - Vascular Surgery

Western University, 22 Oct 2012 to 16 Dec 2012
EL - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jun 2017