THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 10:52:56 AM
Kopac, Daniel Slawomir
CPSO#:
92549
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
21 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
11 Aug 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:311-6051 Gilbert Road
Richmond BC V7C 3V3
Date Received: 21 Jun 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Vascular Surgery |
Effective:11 Oct 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 08 Mar 2010 to 04 Apr 2010
EL - Vascular Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 22 Oct 2012 to 16 Dec 2012
EL - Vascular Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Mar 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 Apr 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Dec 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Aug 2016 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 21 Jun 2017 |