skip to content

Kolawole, Olubukola Folayemi

CPSO#: 96940

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Mar 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Mar 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Yoruba

Education:Obafemi Awolowo University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare
West 5th Campus
Department of Psychiatry
100 West 5th St
Hamilton ON  L9C 0E3
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

69 John Street, Hamilton
Hamilton ON  L8N 2B9
Canada
Phone: 9055221155 Ext. 36309
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

NBRHC, 50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Canada
Phone: (905) 5221155
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. O. Kolawole Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 14 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Kolawole ( CPSO# 96940 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare
Department of Psychiatry
100 West 5th Street
P.O. Box 585
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K5
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



New Brunswick
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:03 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. OLUBUKOLA FOLAYEMI KOLAWOLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOLAWOLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 17 Oct 2011 to 18 Nov 2011
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 19 Nov 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Nov 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 08 May 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Mar 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2019