THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 5:59:07 AM
Kolawole, Olubukola Folayemi
CPSO#:
96940
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Mar 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Mar 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Yoruba
Education: Obafemi Awolowo University, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare
West 5th Campus
Department of Psychiatry
100 West 5th St
Hamilton ON L9C 0E3
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Brunswick
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North Bay Regional Health Centre |
North Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:03 May 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. OLUBUKOLA FOLAYEMI KOLAWOLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOLAWOLE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 17 Oct 2011 to 18 Nov 2011
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 19 Nov 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 17 Oct 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Nov 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Nov 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 08 May 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Mar 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Mar 2019 |