skip to content

Koka, Suman Kumar

CPSO#: 88116

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Oct 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Apr 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Telugu

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
80 Elm St
Sudbury ON  P3C 1T2
Phone: (705) 806-3737
Fax: 705 806-2985 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

2009 Long Lake Rd.
Suite 101
Sudbury ON  P3E 6C3
Canada
Phone: (705) 522-5447
Fax: (705) 522-1797
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

41 Ramsay Lake Rd.
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Canada
Phone: (705) 523-7100
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

181 Elm St.
Sudbury ON  P3C 1T8
Canada
Phone: (705) 564-4150 Ext. 218
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

333 York st.
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J3
Canada
Phone: (705) 674-4221
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

93 Notre Dame Avenue West
Azilda ON  P0M 1B0
Canada
Phone: (705) 805-6074
Fax: 7058056076
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

23 Shingwauk St
Garden River ON  P6A7B2
Canada
Phone: 7059465710
Fax: 7059465702
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

123 March st.
Sault Ste. Marie ON  P6A 2Z5
Canada
Phone: (705) 256-8925
Fax: (705) 256-1266
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

18 Hills Trail
Wikwemikong ON  P0P 2J0
Canada
Phone: (705) 859-3280
Fax: (705) 859-3205
County: Territorial District of Manitoulin
Electoral District: 08

368 Main st
Haileybury ON  P0J 1K0
Canada
Phone: 705-672-1044
Fax: 705-672-1027
County: Territorial District of Timiskaming
Electoral District: 08

32 Sugarbush Rd.
Thessalon ON  P0R 1L0
Canada
Phone: 844-864-0523
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

15 Meredith St.
Little Current ON  P0P 1K0
Canada
Phone: 705-859-3280
Fax: 705-805-3205
County: Territorial District of Manitoulin
Electoral District: 08

689A Hwy 551
Mindemoya ON  P0P 1G0
Canada
Phone: 705-859-3280
Fax: 705-859-3205
County: Territorial District of Manitoulin
Electoral District: 08

336 Pine St
Sudbury ON  P3C 1X8
Canada
Phone: 705-671-7366
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

1280 Lasalle Blvd,
Sudbury, ON
Sudbury ON  P3A1Y8
Canada
Phone: 7052221364
Fax: 7055210729
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

9186 Hwy 93
Midland ON  L4R 4K4
Canada
Phone: 2494925522
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Suman Koka Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Koka ( CPSO# 88116 )

Business Address:
1280 Lasalle Boulevard
Suite 102
Sudbury ON  P3A 1Y8
Phone Number: (705) 560-2227

Business Address:
101 - 2009 Long Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5H2
Phone Number: (705) 522-3380

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Business Address:
181 Elm Street
Sudbury ON  P3C 1T8

Business Address:
18 Hills Trail
Wikwemikong ON  P0P 2J0

Business Address:
689A Old Highway 551
Mindemoya ON  P0P 1G0

Business Address:
23 Shingwauk Street
Garden River ON  P6A 7B2

Business Address:
80 Elm Street
Sudbury ON  P3C 1T2

Business Address:
503 - 123 March Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2Z5

Business Address:
368 Main Street
Haileybury ON  P0J 1K0

Business Address:
2066 Chiefswood Road
Ohsweken ON  N0A 1M0

Business Address:
40 Sugarbush Road
Thessalon ON  P0R 1L0

Business Address:
15 Meredith Street
Little Current ON  P0P 1K0

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:14 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SUMAN KUMAR KOKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOKA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 10 Mar 2008 to 01 Jun 2008
AVP - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 02 Jun 2008 to 09 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 10 Mar 2009 to 09 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Mar 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 May 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 2019

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: February 20, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: February 20, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.


See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)