THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 17:16:23 PM
Koka, Suman Kumar
CPSO#:
88116
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Oct 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Apr 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Telugu
Education: Saba University School of Medicine, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
80 Elm St
Sudbury ON P3C 1T2
Phone: (705) 806-3737
Fax: 705 806-2985
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:14 Jun 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SUMAN KUMAR KOKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOKA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 10 Mar 2008 to 01 Jun 2008
AVP - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 02 Jun 2008 to 09 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 10 Mar 2009 to 09 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 10 Mar 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jun 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Mar 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 31 May 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Oct 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Oct 2011 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Feb 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 20 Feb 2019 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Apr 2019 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: February 20, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: February 20, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)