skip to content

Knowles, Kathleen Florence

CPSO#: 29423

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Aug 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 Aug 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Microbiology Effective: 14 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 02 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Nov 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Aug 2008