THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 9:09:53 AM
Knowles, Kathleen Florence
CPSO#:
29423
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
07 Aug 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
28 Jan 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Medical Microbiology |
Effective:14 Dec 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:02 Dec 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 1977 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 17 Nov 1986 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jan 1991 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 Aug 2008 |