skip to content

Klett, Marie-Josee

CPSO#: 85411

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Jun 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1811 St-Joseph Boulevard
Ottawa ON  K1C 7C6
Phone: (613) 590-0533
Fax: (613) 590-7351 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

PhysioSportPlus
1-1190 Place d'Orleans Dr.
Orléans ON  K1C 7K3
Canada
Phone: (613) 830-4806
Fax: (613) 830-1229
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

University of Ottawa Sport Medicine
& Physiotherapy Clinic
801 King Edward, suite N203
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Canada
Phone: (613) 564-3950
Fax: (613) 564-6627
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Klett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Klett ( CPSO# 85411 )

Business Address:
1 - 1190 Place d'Orleans Drive
Orleans ON  K1C 7K3
Phone Number: (613) 830-4806

Business Address:
N203 - 801 King Edward
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Phone Number: (613) 564-3950

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:21 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARIE-JOSEE KLETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLETT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 27 Jul 2006 to 23 Aug 2006
EL - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 16 Nov 2006 to 29 Nov 2006
EL - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 30 Nov 2006 to 12 Dec 2006
EL - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Dec 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2007