THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 19:59:47 PM
Klett, Marie-Josee
CPSO#:
85411
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Jun 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jun 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1811 St-Joseph Boulevard
Ottawa ON K1C 7C6
Phone: (613) 590-0533
Fax: (613) 590-7351
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:21 Jun 2007 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARIE-JOSEE KLETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLETT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 27 Jul 2006 to 23 Aug 2006
EL - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 16 Nov 2006 to 29 Nov 2006
EL - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 30 Nov 2006 to 12 Dec 2006
EL - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Aug 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Nov 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Dec 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 2007 |