skip to content

Kirkbride, John

CPSO#: 18248

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2003
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Durham, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Occupational Medicine Effective: 21 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Apr 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Mar 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2003