THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 21:22:52 PM
Kirkbride, John
CPSO#:
18248
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
15 May 1981
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Durham, 1957
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Occupational Medicine |
Effective:21 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 May 1962 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Apr 1965 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Feb 1968 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 26 Mar 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 May 1981 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2003 |