skip to content

Kieraszewicz, Halina Therese

CPSO#: 29880

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 May 2021
EXPIRY DATE
21 May 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 May 1978

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital 395 Carrie St Strathroy ON N7G 3C9
Date Received: 20 Apr 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:19 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 May 2021