THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 9:57:59 AM
Kieraszewicz, Halina Therese
CPSO#:
29880
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
21 May 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 May 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
395 Carrie St
Strathroy ON N7G 3C9
Date Received: 20 Apr 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:19 Nov 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 1976 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 May 1978 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 21 May 2021 |