skip to content

Khodaei, Minoo

CPSO#: 92866

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Dec 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
200-370 Bayview Dr
HealthPark Medical Clinics
Barrie ON  L4N 7L3
Phone: (705) 315-2801
Fax: 705-722-7933 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Khodaei Thornton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Khodaei ( CPSO# 92866 )
Dr. A. Thornton ( CPSO# 93641 )

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MINOO KHODAEI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHODAEI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 02 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Western University, 03 May 2011 to 19 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 20 Nov 2011 to 19 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Nov 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2012