THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 6:16:29 AM
Khodaei, Minoo
CPSO#:
92866
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Dec 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Dec 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
200-370 Bayview Dr
HealthPark Medical Clinics
Barrie ON L4N 7L3
Phone: (705) 315-2801
Fax: 705-722-7933
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre |
Barrie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:11 Dec 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MINOO KHODAEI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHODAEI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 02 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 03 May 2011 to 19 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 20 Nov 2011 to 19 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Nov 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Dec 2012 |