skip to content

Khan, Sher Baz

CPSO#: 87566

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Nov 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Nov 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Peshawar, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Cortelluci Vaughan Hospital
Maple ON  L6A 4Z3
Phone: 9054172000 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sher Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Khan ( CPSO# 87566 )

Business Address:
Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHER BAZ KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 2008

Concerns

Source: Other
Active Date: February 20, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
FINDING OF GUILT

Sher Baz Khan was found guilty of the following offence:

Having over 80 mg blood alcohol concentration within two hours after ceasing to operate a conveyance, contrary to Section 320.14(1)(b) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

DATE: February 20, 2020
SENTENCE: 18-month driving prohibition; Fine of $3000