THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 10:36:44 AM
Khan, Sher Baz
CPSO#:
87566
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Nov 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Nov 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: University of Peshawar, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Cortelluci Vaughan Hospital
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Phone: 9054172000
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHER BAZ KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 2007 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Nov 2008 |
Concerns
Source:
Other
Active Date: February 20, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
FINDING OF GUILT
Sher Baz Khan was found guilty of the following offence:
Having over 80 mg blood alcohol concentration within two hours after ceasing to operate a conveyance, contrary to Section 320.14(1)(b) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
DATE: February 20, 2020
SENTENCE: 18-month driving prohibition; Fine of $3000