skip to content

Khan, Shajia

CPSO#: 24540

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jul 2020
EXPIRY DATE
01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 May 1972

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Osmania University, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Dynacare in Ottawa Contact information: Angel Charron, Customer Service Phone 613 738 1242, ext 6221. Fax 613 738 8943. Email [email protected]
Date Received: 15 Jun 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:01 Jan 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020