THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 18:02:55 PM
Khan, Shajia
CPSO#:
24540
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 May 1972
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Urdu
Education: Osmania University, 1965
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Dynacare in Ottawa
Contact information: Angel Charron, Customer Service Phone 613 738 1242, ext 6221. Fax 613 738 8943. Email [email protected]
Date Received: 15 Jun 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Jan 1971 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Aug 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 May 1972 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2020 |