skip to content

Khan, Rubeena

CPSO#: 87766

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Sep 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Sep 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Lucknow, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Clinic D
4-1015 Golflinks Rd.
Ancaster ON  L9K 1L6
Phone: 289 808 2230
Fax: 2899192511 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

2540 Postmaster Drive
Oakville ON  L6M 0N2
Canada
Phone: (905) 847-5437
Fax: (905)469-8327
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

2537 Hamilton Regional Road 56
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z5
Canada
Phone: 905 692 2580
Fax: 905 692 0258
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

100 Humber College Blvd
Toronto ON  M9V 5G4
Canada
Phone: 18778724477
Fax: 8778724511
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rubeena Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 01 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Khan ( CPSO# 87766 )

Business Address:
1015 Golf Links Road
Ancaster ON  L9K 1L6
Phone Number: (289) 239-6900

Business Address:
Unit B6
2537 Hamilton Regional Road 56
Hamilton ON  L0R 1C0
Phone Number: (905) 692-2580

Business Address:
2540 Postmaster Drive
Oakville ON  L6M 0N2
Phone Number: (905) 847-5437

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RUBEENA KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 26 Sep 2007 to 18 Dec 2007
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 19 Dec 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Pediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Pediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Pediatric Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Dec 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jun 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Dec 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2016