THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 1:33:19 AM
Khan, Rubeena
CPSO#:
87766
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Sep 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Sep 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Urdu
Education: University of Lucknow, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1039 Upper James Street
Hamilton Medical Room
Hamilton ON L9C 3A6
Phone: 905-304-8881
Fax: 289-919-2511
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RUBEENA KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 26 Sep 2007 to 18 Dec 2007
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 19 Dec 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Pediatric Cardiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 03 Oct 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Dec 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Dec 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jun 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Dec 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Sep 2016 |