skip to content

Khalid-Khan, Sarosh

CPSO#: 88256

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Dec 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Dow Medical College, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Sciences Centre;
Hotel Dieu Hospital site:
Dept of Psychiatry;
166 Brock Street, Brock 5; #B5-025
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3400 Ext. 2554
Fax: (613) 544-7623 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S. Khalid-Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Khalid-Khan ( CPSO# 88256 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
Suite B5-025
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:17 May 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective:26 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SAROSH KHALID-KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHALID-KHAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jun 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 May 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Dec 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2017