THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 19:31:13 PM
Khalid-Khan, Sarosh
CPSO#:
88256
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Dec 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Dec 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: Dow Medical College, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Sciences Centre;
Hotel Dieu Hospital site:
Dept of Psychiatry;
166 Brock Street, Brock 5; #B5-025
Kingston ON K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3400 Ext. 2554
Fax: (613) 544-7623
Electoral District: 06
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Pennsylvania
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:17 May 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry |
Effective:26 Sep 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SAROSH KHALID-KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHALID-KHAN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2008 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jun 2008 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 May 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 May 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Dec 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Dec 2017 |